House
|
05/24/2023
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 5171
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
Journal Page: 5171
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5171
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 399
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 170
|
Senate
|
12/08/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|