E | 06/18/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3309 | |
E | 05/23/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2543 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2411 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2247 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Record vote | RV#1845 | Journal Page: 4641 |
House | 05/19/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4624 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4624 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4048 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3616 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 170 | |
Senate | 12/14/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/14/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |