Senate | 03/01/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 296 | |
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 251 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 12/19/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |