E | 06/18/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3309 | |
E | 05/22/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2429 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2291 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2243 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2145 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4657 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Record vote | RV#1856 | Journal Page: 4656 |
House | 05/19/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4656 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4656 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4600 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#1836 | Journal Page: 4599 |
House | 05/18/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4599 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4599 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4387 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1387 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1387 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 12/19/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |