House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2191
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1257
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hall
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1256
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1255
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 395
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 328
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 251
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 175
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 190
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 135
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 125
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 105
|
Senate
|
12/21/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|