Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB330 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 26, 2023
Bill December 21, 2022
Bill December 21, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 21, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023