Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill December 28, 2022
Bill December 28, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 2, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023