E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1992
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4937
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4937
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1108
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1108
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1108
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1079
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1039
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1006
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 175
|
Senate
|
12/28/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|