Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB338 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill December 28, 2022
Bill December 28, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 5, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 5, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 6, 2023