House | 04/18/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 476 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1629 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 12/29/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/29/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |