Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 9, 2023
Bill December 29, 2022
Bill December 29, 2022
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 16, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill March 16, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 9, 2023