Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB348 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2023

                    By: Springer S.B. No. 348
 (In the Senate - Filed January 4, 2023; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 March 29, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 29, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prohibition on posting on the Internet information
 held by an appraisal district regarding certain residential
 property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.027(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  Subsection (a)(1) does not apply to:
 (1)  an aerial photograph that depicts [five or] more
 than one separately owned building;
 (2)  a street level photograph of only the exterior of a
 building; or
 (3)  a field record or overhead sketch of the property
 that depicts only:
 (A)  the outline of one or more buildings on the
 property;
 (B)  the general landscape features of the
 property, including ponds, pools, and walls; and
 (C)  the dimensions of or distances between the
 buildings and features depicted [buildings].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *