Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB348 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 28, 2023
Bill January 4, 2023
Bill January 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 29, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 19, 2023