E | 05/23/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/23/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2543 | |
E | 05/11/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1817 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4045 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1751 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3608 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1373 | Journal Page: 3607 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3607 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3607 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3386 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3386 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 1192 | Journal Page: 3386 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3074 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/30/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 668 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 618 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 179 | |
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |