Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 17, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 23, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 30, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023