House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1300 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1300 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 632 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 632 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 632 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 632 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Kolkhorst | Journal Page: 631 |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 508 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1300 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 180 | |
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |