Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 13, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 20, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill March 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023