House | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2332 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2332 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2194 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1325 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hall | Journal Page: 1303 |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1182 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2332 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 181 | |
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |