Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 24, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023