E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5891
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2134
|
Journal Page: 5546
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5546
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2532
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4608
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4608
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4608
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2050
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4349
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1740
|
Journal Page: 4348
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4348
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4348
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4270
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Amended
|
1-S. Thompson and Davis
|
Journal Page: 4269
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4269
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/15/23 4:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1467
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 956
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1528
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 182
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|