1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 409 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the rights of victims, guardians of victims, and close |
---|
6 | 6 | | relatives of deceased victims in the criminal justice system. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Articles 56A.052(a), (b), and (c), Code of |
---|
9 | 9 | | Criminal Procedure, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (a) A [If the offense is a sexual assault, a] victim, |
---|
11 | 11 | | guardian of a victim, or close relative of a deceased victim of an |
---|
12 | 12 | | offense under Section 21.02, 21.11, 22.011, 22.012, 22.021, or |
---|
13 | 13 | | 42.072, Penal Code, is entitled to the following rights within the |
---|
14 | 14 | | criminal justice system: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) if requested, the right to a disclosure of |
---|
16 | 16 | | information regarding: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (A) any evidence that was collected during the |
---|
18 | 18 | | investigation of the offense, unless disclosing the information |
---|
19 | 19 | | would interfere with the investigation or prosecution of the |
---|
20 | 20 | | offense, in which event the victim, guardian, or relative shall be |
---|
21 | 21 | | informed of the estimated date on which that information is |
---|
22 | 22 | | expected to be disclosed; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | (B) the status of any analysis being performed on |
---|
24 | 24 | | [of] any evidence described by Paragraph (A); |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) if requested, the right to be notified: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (A) at the time a request is submitted to a crime |
---|
27 | 27 | | laboratory to process and analyze any evidence that was collected |
---|
28 | 28 | | during the investigation of the offense; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (B) at the time of the submission of a request to |
---|
30 | 30 | | compare any biological evidence collected during the investigation |
---|
31 | 31 | | of the offense with DNA profiles maintained in a state or federal |
---|
32 | 32 | | DNA database; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (C) of the results of the comparison described by |
---|
34 | 34 | | Paragraph (B), unless disclosing the results would interfere with |
---|
35 | 35 | | the investigation or prosecution of the offense, in which event the |
---|
36 | 36 | | victim, guardian, or relative shall be informed of the estimated |
---|
37 | 37 | | date on which those results are expected to be disclosed; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (3) if requested, the right to counseling regarding |
---|
39 | 39 | | acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS) and human |
---|
40 | 40 | | immunodeficiency virus (HIV) infection; [and] |
---|
41 | 41 | | (4) if requested, the right to be informed about, and |
---|
42 | 42 | | confer with the attorney representing the state regarding, the |
---|
43 | 43 | | disposition of the offense, including sharing the victim's, |
---|
44 | 44 | | guardian's, or relative's views regarding: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (A) a decision not to file charges; |
---|
46 | 46 | | (B) the dismissal of charges; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (C) the use of a pretrial intervention program; |
---|
48 | 48 | | or |
---|
49 | 49 | | (D) a plea bargain agreement; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (5) for the victim, the right to: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (A) testing for acquired immune deficiency |
---|
52 | 52 | | syndrome (AIDS), human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) infection, |
---|
53 | 53 | | antibodies to HIV, or infection with any other probable causative |
---|
54 | 54 | | agent of AIDS; and |
---|
55 | 55 | | (B) a forensic medical examination to the extent |
---|
56 | 56 | | provided by Subchapters F and G if, within 120 hours of the offense: |
---|
57 | 57 | | (i) the offense is reported to a law |
---|
58 | 58 | | enforcement agency; or |
---|
59 | 59 | | (ii) a forensic medical examination is |
---|
60 | 60 | | otherwise conducted by [at] a health care provider. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (b) Subject to Subsection (c), a [A] victim, guardian of a |
---|
62 | 62 | | victim, or close relative of a deceased victim who requests to be |
---|
63 | 63 | | notified or receive information under Subsection (a)(1), (2), or |
---|
64 | 64 | | (4) [(a)(2)] must: |
---|
65 | 65 | | (1) provide a current address and phone number to the |
---|
66 | 66 | | attorney representing the state and the law enforcement agency that |
---|
67 | 67 | | is investigating the offense; and |
---|
68 | 68 | | (2) [. The victim, guardian, or relative must] inform |
---|
69 | 69 | | the attorney representing the state and the law enforcement agency |
---|
70 | 70 | | of any change in the address or phone number. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (c) A victim, guardian of a victim, or close relative of a |
---|
72 | 72 | | deceased victim may designate a person, including an entity that |
---|
73 | 73 | | provides services to victims of an offense described by Subsection |
---|
74 | 74 | | (a) [sexual assault], to receive any notice requested under |
---|
75 | 75 | | Subsection (a)(2). |
---|
76 | 76 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 56A, Code of Criminal |
---|
77 | 77 | | Procedure, is amended by adding Article 56A.0531 to read as |
---|
78 | 78 | | follows: |
---|
79 | 79 | | Art. 56A.0531. ASSERTION OF RIGHTS. A victim, guardian of a |
---|
80 | 80 | | victim, or close relative of a deceased victim may assert the rights |
---|
81 | 81 | | provided by this chapter either orally or in writing. |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
83 | 83 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
84 | 84 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
85 | 85 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 409 passed the Senate on |
---|
86 | 86 | | April 13, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; |
---|
87 | 87 | | May 17, 2023, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
88 | 88 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 19, 2023, House |
---|
89 | 89 | | granted request of the Senate; May 25, 2023, Senate adopted |
---|
90 | 90 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
91 | 91 | | Nays 0. |
---|
92 | 92 | | ______________________________ |
---|
93 | 93 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
94 | 94 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 409 passed the House, with |
---|
95 | 95 | | amendments, on May 16, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 140, |
---|
96 | 96 | | Nays 0, one present not voting; May 19, 2023, House granted request |
---|
97 | 97 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
98 | 98 | | May 25, 2023, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
99 | 99 | | following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, three present not voting. |
---|
100 | 100 | | ______________________________ |
---|
101 | 101 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
102 | 102 | | Approved: |
---|
103 | 103 | | ______________________________ |
---|
104 | 104 | | Date |
---|
105 | 105 | | ______________________________ |
---|
106 | 106 | | Governor |
---|