Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB410 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 11, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023