Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 12, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023

Enrolled

Analysis June 27, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2023