LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB462
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB462
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB462
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/16/2023
9:00 am
Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.028
SB412
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB459
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB462
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
SB902
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
SB1055
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/10/2023 E See remarks for effective date