E | 05/05/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/05/2023 | Filed without the Governor's signature | Journal Page: 1609 | |
E | 04/25/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1311 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2046 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1247 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1203 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Record vote | RV#417 | Journal Page: 1825 |
House | 04/21/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1825 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1767 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1767 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 861 | Journal Page: 1767 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 477 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 197 | |
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |