Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB497 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 1, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 16, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 16, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 13, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 25, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 7, 2023