E
|
06/16/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2247
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1845
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4626
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4626
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4387
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1634
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 200
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|