Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023