Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 2, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis July 5, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 5, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 1, 2023