Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 6, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 24, 2023