House | 04/17/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1528 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1528 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1046 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 770 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Johnson | Journal Page: 748 |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 748 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 202 | |
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |