Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 27, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 29, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note April 9, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023