E | 06/18/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3309 | |
E | 05/29/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3307 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5890 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2966 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2684 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2574 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5189 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Record vote | RV#2043 | Journal Page: 5189 |
House | 05/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 5189 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5189 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5119 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5119 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4997 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1387 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1387 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 202 | |
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |