Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB545 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 6, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 13, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 29, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 7, 2023