House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1634
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1018
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1018
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1018
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1018
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1018
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1017
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 203
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|