Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB553 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023