House | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 2785 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2785 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1350 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1350 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1350 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Sparks | Journal Page: 1350 |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1350 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1349 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2785 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |