Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB561 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 27, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 27, 2023