Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 204 | |
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |