Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB567 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 04/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Springer S.B. No. 567
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 April 17, 2023, reported favorably from Committee on Education by
 the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to firefighters enrolled in fire science courses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.353, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 54.353. FIREFIGHTERS ENROLLED IN FIRE SCIENCE
 COURSES.  (a) The governing board of an institution of higher
 education shall exempt from the payment of tuition and laboratory
 fees any student enrolled in one or more courses offered as part of
 a fire science curriculum who:
 (1)  is employed as a firefighter by a political
 subdivision of this state; or
 (2)  is a member in good standing in a volunteer
 firefighter department, registered with Texas Forest Service and
 providing 911 service to a designated area [is currently, and has
 been for at least one year, an active member of an organized
 volunteer fire department participating in the Texas Emergency
 Services Retirement System or a retirement system established under
 the Texas Local Fire Fighters Retirement Act (Article 6243e,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes)] and who: [holds:]
 (A)  attends at least 20 hours of annual training;
 (B)  attends or provides support services for at
 least 25 percent of the department's emergencies in a calendar
 year; and
 (C)  holds:
 (i) [(A)]  an Accredited Advanced level of
 certification, or an equivalent successor certification, under the
 State Firemen's and Fire Marshals' Association of Texas volunteer
 certification program; or
 (ii) [(B)]  Phase V (Firefighter II)
 certification, or an equivalent successor certification, under the
 Texas Commission on Fire Protection's voluntary certification
 program under Section 419.071, Government Code.
 (b)  An exemption provided under this section does not apply
 to deposits that may be required in the nature of security for the
 return or proper care of property loaned for the use of students.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a student who for a
 semester or term at an institution of higher education receives an
 exemption under this section may continue to receive the exemption
 for a subsequent semester or term at any institution only if the
 student makes satisfactory academic progress toward a degree or
 certificate at that institution as determined by the institution
 for purposes of financial aid.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the exemption provided
 under this section does not apply to any amount of additional
 tuition the institution elects to charge a resident undergraduate
 student under Section 54.014(a) or (f).
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the exemption provided
 under this section does not apply to any amount of tuition the
 institution charges a graduate student in excess of the amount of
 tuition charged to similarly situated graduate students because the
 student has a number of semester credit hours of doctoral work in
 excess of the applicable number provided by Section 61.059(l)(1) or
 (2).
 (f)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 adopt:
 (1)  rules governing the granting or denial of an
 exemption under this section, including rules relating to the
 determination of a student's eligibility for an exemption; and
 (2)  a uniform listing of degree programs covered by
 the exemption under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *