Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB569 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/17/2023 9:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2023 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 4 2023 8:56PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 6 2023 3:49PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Referred to Business & Industry: Apr 27 2023 6:39PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar