Senate | 04/26/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1308 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 506 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |