E
|
05/19/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
E
|
05/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1656
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3246
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3246
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 984
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 704
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 685
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 506
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 209
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|