Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 13, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 29, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 25, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023