House | 05/08/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3466 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3466 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2047 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1229 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Springer | Journal Page: 1226 |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Springer | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3466 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |