Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB624 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Analysis April 15, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2023
Analysis March 26, 2023