E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5616
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2784
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2784
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2784
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2778
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1987
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4935
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1962
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
1-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4376
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 4376
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4375
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 774
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 477
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 383
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 211
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|