Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB643 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 14, 2023
Bill January 27, 2023
Bill January 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill March 16, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 13, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 19, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis July 19, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023