Senate | 05/11/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1654 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1400 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |