E | 05/24/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2684 | |
E | 05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1764 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3871 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1490 | Journal Page: 3870 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3870 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3870 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3808 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3808 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 131 | Journal Page: 3808 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2041 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2041 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1835 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1079 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 378 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2041 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 150 | |
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |